Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jesse Keifer vs Psalm Keifer
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by Keifer, Jesse, against Keifer, Psalm A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge D. Tyler Tharpe presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 4 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent signed FL judg for entry and scanning to FLEX oa's conformed copies mailed to parties |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Petitioner's Preliminary filed in open court |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 09/06/17 Judicial Officer: D Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: D Flautz Bailiff: R Harley Petitioner: Present, sworn Pro Per Respondent: Present Pro Per Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 10/17/18 Time: 9:30a.m. Dept: 202 The parties have reached an agreement. The Court received a completed Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure from Petitioner. There is no personal property or assets or debts to divide. Parties agree they would not pay or receive spousal support and spousal support is set at $0.00. Court's jurisdiction on Spousal Support is terminated. |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept.: 202 Clerk: E Flores Reporter: C. Hernandez Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present You are hereby ordered to appear in Department 202 on Wednesday, September 6, at 11:00 a.m., to show cause why the above-referenced case should not be dismissed. California law requires that Family Law matters proceed in an effective and timely manner from initial filing to final disposition. (Fam. Code 2450, subd. (a), and Standards of Judicial Administration, standard 5.30.) In deciding whether a case is progressing in an effective and timely manner, the Court considers procedural milestones, including the following: (A) A proof of service of Summons and petition should be filed within 60 days of case initiation; (B) If no response has been filed, and the parties have not agreed on an extension of time to respond, a request to enter default should be submitted within 60 days after the date the response was due; (C) The petitioner's preliminary declaration of disclosure should be served within 60 days of the filing of the petition; (D) When a default has been entered, a judgment should be submitted within 60 days of the entry of default; (E) Whether a trial date has been requested or scheduled; and (F) When the parties have notified the court that they are actively negotiating or mediating their case, a written agreement for judgment is submitted within six months of the date the petition was filed, or a request for trial date is submitted. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 5.83(c)(4).) The Court has reason to believe that the above-referenced case is not progressing in an effective and timely manner. |
|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for Judgment Review |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for review of Judgment. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 3/16/2016 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: M. Vang Bailiff: R Harley Petitioner: not present Respondent: not present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Continued to: Next family centered case status conference Date: 4/19/2017 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept: 202 |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for review of Judgment |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Default with no Judgment entered as to Psalm Keifer |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed 9.15.15 but not entered. Defective. |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Sent default to default desk |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep File Stamped 9.15.15 but not entered on system. Document is defective. |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution with Children issued summon |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |