Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ernie Vea et al vs Paul Abbott et al
A 32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
April 14, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Category
32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration of Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Prejudgment Claim, Filed | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Unlawful Detainer, Filed | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion |