Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
People of the State of California vs Robert Leavens Stert
A Misdemeanor case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Adams, Thomas R presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 25, 2013
Last Refreshed
March 01, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Category
Misdemeanor
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Case Outcome Type
Disposition
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Cite Release, Filed | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | DOJ Request - Initial | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Unscheduled Event Completed/Held | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Misdemeanor Amended, Filed | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Cite Release, Filed | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Misdemeanor, Filed |