Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ocean Bank vs Malante Malik Hayworth
An Unlimited Enforcement Of Judgment (20) case was filed by Ocean Bank, represented by Friedman, Heywood G, against Hayworth, Malante Malik, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 24, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 29, 2023
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Category
Unlimited Enforcement of Judgment (20)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Foreign,Sister-State Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed
Date: Dec 18, 2017Reject Letter
Date: Nov 29, 2017Application, Filed
Date: Sep 24, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
MemoOfCosts Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed Memorandum of Costs |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution, Issued to SB County in the amount of $298,215.22 |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reject Letter re: Memo of Costs & Writ - incorrect interest amount & must be efiled |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application, Filed Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document, Filed Clerk's Judgment on Sister-State Judgment, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Complaint |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |