Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Community West Bank NA vs Eduardo Sanchez et al
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 20, 2010
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2022
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Brown, James;Category
civil
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Undertaking | |
October 26, 2011 | Tentative Ruling | Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Exonerate Bond Plaintiff Community West Bank, N.A., sued defendants Eduardo Sanchez and Rita Battistella-Sanchez, dba Eduardo Sanchez Antiques, for return of collateral ...
Judge: Donna Geck |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed | |
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion, Filed | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing, Filed | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Application, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Undertaking | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession | |
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion |