Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HOUSEHOLD BANK VS LAYNE, BRIAN
A Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case was filed by Household Bank, represented by Mann Bracken, against Layne, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge Scott, William presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2004
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT FROM 10/03/05 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/JUDGMENT ENTERED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Scott, William O |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $-0- INTEREST $50.17 CREDIT $-0- Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED BUTTE CK 818762 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 332427 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: SWB 413 - $7.00 | |
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED CK 818763 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 332428 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: SWB 415 - $7.00 |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed SUMMONS RETURNED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Clerk DEFAULT JMT BY CLERK FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT: BRIAN LAYNE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS COMPLAINT ON BRIAN LAYNE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 WITHOUT PREJUDICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT FROM 08/08/05 Notice Date: 2005-08-11 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 11/28/05 Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Scott, William O |
|
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
September 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement [P] CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
September 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF PLTFS COUNSEL IN SUPP OF REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: LAYNE, BRIAN PartyId: 133810_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2005-08-30 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Personal | |
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONT FROM 08/08/05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUACE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT FROM 06/20/05 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 10/03/05 Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Scott, William O |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF PLTF'S COUNSEL IN SUPP OF REQ FOR CONT OF CASE MGMT CONF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement [P] CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 08/2/05 Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Scott, William O |
|
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF PLTFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement [P] CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
November 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COVER SHEET [CIVIL] Case Category Code: 09 Remedies: (M, N, P) # c/a: Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K COMPLAINT FILED - 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (UNDER 10K) CK#678784 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 296225 Fee Amount: 155.30 Entry Clerk: SLG 11 - $2.00 278 - $55.00 37 - $29.00 36 - $3.00 46 - $3.00 280 - $8.30 284 - $25.00 324 - $20.00 329 - $10.00 |