Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Woodlands at Webb Bridge Condominium Association, Inc.VS.Reginald Cooper
A Foreclosure case was filed by Woodlands At Webb Bridge Condominium Association, Inc., represented by Luper, Steven Jeffrey, against Cooper, Reginald, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge KRAUSE, RACHEL presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 29, 2023
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Category
FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 17, 2022SHERIFFS ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 06, 2022CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: Dec 02, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF FIERI FACIAS ISSUED AND SENT TO RECORDING |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Issuance of Fifa |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONSENT JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING CONSENT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Consent Judgment Default Judgment |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Consent Judgment Default |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONSENT JUDGMENT Final Consent Judgment |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to File a Motion for Default Judgment and Notice of 2 17 2022 Default Hearing |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE SERVED - REGINALD COOPER |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriff Entry of Service | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM REAL PROPERTY |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Foreclosure and Damages PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|