Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RES-GA NINE, LLC vs. DAVID FULLER
A Contract/Account case was filed by Res Ga Nine Llc, represented by Fitze, Sabrina G., against Fuller, David, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge SCHWALL, CRAIG presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 29, 2012
Last Refreshed
December 19, 2023
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Category
CONTRACT/ACCOUNT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
FIFA
Date: May 21, 2013CASE DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 06, 2013CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 17, 2013AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jan 31, 2013ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Oct 26, 2012CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: Jun 29, 2012Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
FIFA
Judge: FIFA |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: CASE DISPOSITION FORM |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: AFFIDAVIT |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
MICROFILMED FILE
Judge: MICROFILMED FILE |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer: SCHWALL, CRAIG)
Judge: SCHWALL, CRAIG |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Judge: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING
Judge: NOTICE OF FILING |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: AFFIDAVIT |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING
Judge: NOTICE OF FILING |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Action Type
Judge: Action Type |