Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARY CLAIRE LINDSEY GRAHAM vs. ZOLLIE SMITH GRAHAM
A Divorce - Contested case was filed by Graham, Mary Claire Lindsey, against Graham, Zollie Smith, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge GOGER, JOHN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Judge
Hon. GOGER, JOHN
Category
DIVORCE - CONTESTED
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
MICROFILMED FILE
Judge: MICROFILMED FILE |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: AFFIDAVIT |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
MICROFILMED FILE
Judge: MICROFILMED FILE |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ORDER
Judge: DISMISSAL ORDER |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
THIRTY DAY CONFERENCE (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer: GOGER, JOHN)
Judge: GOGER, JOHN |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
STANDING ORDER
Judge: STANDING ORDER |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (INDEX AND NOT SCAN)
Judge: DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (INDEX AND NOT SCAN |