Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHERYL LEIGH GALANG vs. MARIO ANTHONY GALANG
A Divorce - Contested case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge LANE, BENSONETTA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 18, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Judge
Hon. LANE, BENSONETTA
Category
DIVORCE - CONTESTED
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
60 DAY CONFERENCE (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Judge: FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT
Judge: AGREEMENT |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ATTEND 60 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: ORDER TO ATTEND 60 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
60 DAY CONFERENCE (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
60 DAY CONFERENCE (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ATTEND 60 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: ORDER TO ATTEND 60 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
THIRTY DAY CONFERENCE (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER
Judge: ANSWER |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |