Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YOLAND DIVINE RICE vs. TEMITOPE ODUNEYE ODUSANYA
A Divorce - Contested case was filed by Rice, Yoland Divine, against Odusanya, Temitope Oduneye, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge LANE, BENSONETTA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 20, 2006
Last Refreshed
August 20, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Judge
Hon. LANE, BENSONETTA
Category
DIVORCE - CONTESTED
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Date: Mar 06, 2006CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: Jan 20, 2006CONSENT ORDER
Date: Jan 20, 2006ACKNOWLEDGE OF COUNSEL
Date: Jan 20, 2006Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
MICROFILMED FILE
Judge: MICROFILMED FILE |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Judge: FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE |
|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
UNCONTESTED DOMESTIC (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONSENT ORDER
Judge: CONSENT ORDER |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGE OF COUNSEL
Judge: ACKNOWLEDGE OF COUNSEL |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: NOTICE OF HEARING |