Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JAMES PRESERVED LLC DBA VS FRENCHKISS ATLANTA
A Contract case was filed by James Preserved Denim Llc Dba James Cured By Seun, represented by Stokes Lazarus & Carmichael Llp, against Frenchkiss Atlanta Inc, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge Porter, Patsy Y presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2005
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2021
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Judge
Category
CONTRACT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | FIFA TO PLTF | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | READY NON JURY | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event | PAYMENT | |
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event | STATE COURT SUIT 1 SVS |