Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PARKRIDGE EAST EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT et al vs MARTINEZ ADAM LEE
A Contract/Account case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 14, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 13, 2022
Filing Location
Catoosa County, GA
Category
CONTRACT/ACCOUNT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION: JUDGMENT | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION DSP |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | DSP | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT: CONSENT | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
SERVED: PERSONALLY ADAM MARTINEZ |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ADAM MARTINEZ | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON JURY NJ |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION/COMPLAINT PET |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NJ | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PET |