Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTY OF ORANGE vs. BLANCA S VALENCIA
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by County Of Orange, represented by County Of Orange, against Valencia, Blanca S, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Case Duration
13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 12/24/2012 | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 12/24/2012 10:33:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATION - PARENTAGE & SUPPORT (GOVT) 12/24/2012 10:33:00 # Pages:15 |
|
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATION - PARENTAGE & SUPPORT 12/24/2012 10:33:00 # Pages:15 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 12/11/2012 00:00:00 # Pages:15 |
|