Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTY OF ORANGE vs. BIANCA T CERDA
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST - DISMISSAL 05/20/2013 10:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL - REQUEST OF PARTY 05/20/2013 | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 12/11/2012 00:00:00 # Pages:15 |
|