Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NGUYEN V TRAN
A Dissolution With Child case was filed by Nguyen, Hung Minh, against Tran, Thuy Thi Phoung, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge HONER, SHERRI L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 years, 11 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 11/16/2015 09:39:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 10/16/2015 14:06:00 # Pages:1 |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 09/11/2015 15:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 08/06/2015 11:36:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 07/16/2015 09:51:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 06/12/2015 12:29:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 05/14/2015 10:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 04/10/2015 07:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 03/10/2015 15:43:00 # Pages:1 |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 02/11/2015 14:21:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 01/28/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 12/10/2014 16:05:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 11/19/2014 08:14:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 10/24/2014 15:27:00 # Pages:1 |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 09/11/2014 09:48:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 08/15/2014 15:58:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 07/11/2014 16:10:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 06/09/2014 12:28:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 06/09/2014 14:41:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 05/28/2014 11:56:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 06, 2014 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - ORDER AFTER HEARING 03/06/2014 08:30:00 # Pages:4 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 02/18/2014 15:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 02/18/2014 15:21:00 # Pages:15 | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST - REIMBURSEMENT 02/18/2014 15:28:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 18, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING CHILD CUSTODY EVALUATOR 12/18/2013 09:40:00 # Pages:3 |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 12/18/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION - STATUS 12/13/2013 16:44:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 06, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT 12/06/2013 13:55:00 # Pages:11 |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 12/06/2013 08:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/06/2013 13:58:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/06/2013 13:58:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 05, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - EX PARTE 11/05/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 04, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW | |
October 30, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/30/2013 09:27:00 GRANTED # Pages:2 | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/30/2013 09:28:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 10/02/2013 16:06:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 16, 2013 | hearing | HRG - DEFAULT | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/16/2013 16:35:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 08/16/2013 16:35:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 08/16/2013 08:15:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 08/16/2013 16:32:00 # Pages:18 |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 08/16/2013 | |
July 03, 2013 | hearing | HRG - DEFAULT | |
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 07/03/2013 08:15:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 05/23/2013 08:54:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 05/22/2013 16:16:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/22/2013 16:17:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/22/2013 16:16:00 # Pages:4 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/22/2013 16:15:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/22/2013 14:58:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 10, 2013 | hearing | CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 04/18/2013 11:21:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1 |
|
April 10, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - ORDER AFTER HEARING 04/10/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:4 |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE FOR MEDIATION 04/04/2013 11:14:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 02, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 01/02/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION - STATUS 01/02/2013 11:25:00 # Pages:3 |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/02/2013 11:34:00 # Pages:4 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER 12/19/2012 13:47:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/11/2012 12:10:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED - PAYMENT(S) ORDERED 12/11/2012 16:20:00 PAYMENTS # Pages:2 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/11/2012 09:12:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/11/2012 12:09:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons 12/11/2012 12:09:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/11/2012 12:10:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 12/11/2012 09:11:00 # Pages:13 |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 12/11/2012 12:59:00 $435/$60/$60$30 5C SENT TO DEPT.L69 EX-PARTE # Pages:2 |