Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HUGHES V HUGHES
A Dissolution Without Child case was filed by Hughes, David Michael, against Hughes, Tamara Kim, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Duration
3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/25/2013 13:54:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 03/25/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:3 |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 03/25/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:7 |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/25/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/25/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 03/25/2013 | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/22/2013 15:31:00 # Pages:2 |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 01/03/2013 10:31:00 # Pages:2 |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 01/03/2013 10:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/04/2012 09:27:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons 12/04/2012 09:28:00 # Pages:3 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/04/2012 09:26:00 # Pages:2 |
|