Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FULLER V FULLER
A Dissolution Without Child case was filed by Fuller, Vicky S, represented by Mjv Law Pc, against Fuller, Donald C, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Duration
3 years, 3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | hearing | HEARING - NOTICE - DISMISS - NO SERVICE | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 02/19/2016 |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - DISMISS NO PROOF OF SERVICE 01/21/2016 |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 11/16/2012 13:51:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RETURNED CHECK 11/15/2012 15:39:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons 11/09/2012 13:39:00 SECOND ISSUE # Pages:2 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons 10/31/2012 13:37:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/31/2012 13:36:00 # Pages:3 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/31/2012 13:38:00 # Pages:1 |
|