Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NELSON V NELSON
A Dissolution With Child case was filed by Nelson, Jesse, against Nelson, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge WILSON, RENEE E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 years, 8 months and 13 days
Time To Trial
5 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2016 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/12/2016 |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPORT CALCULATION PRINTOUT 01/12/2016 |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 01/12/2016 |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 01/11/2016 |
|
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM - CHILD CUSTODY INVESTIGATION 12/24/2015 | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 10/28/2015 09:05:00 # Pages:3 |
|
September 02, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 09/02/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:2 |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 09/02/2015 15:50:00 # Pages:1 |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 09/02/2015 15:31:00 # Pages:3 |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING CHILD CUSTODY EVALUATOR 09/02/2015 15:30:00 # Pages:3 |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION 08/31/2015 09:22:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION 08/26/2015 14:56:00 # Pages:32 |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 08/24/2015 09:24:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 08/24/2015 09:18:00 # Pages:18 |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/24/2015 09:24:00 # Pages:16 |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/24/2015 09:24:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 19, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 08/19/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION 08/07/2015 11:41:00 # Pages:30 |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION - STATUS 08/03/2015 11:32:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 07/27/2015 07:54:00 # Pages:4 |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 07/23/2015 10:36:00 # Pages:3 |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - ATTORNEY FEE 07/22/2015 11:08:00 # Pages:5 |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 07/22/2015 10:28:00 # Pages:3 |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ERRATA 07/22/2015 11:07:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT 07/06/2015 08:40:00 730 EVALUATION # Pages:9 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/06/2015 08:41:00 # Pages:9 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION 07/06/2015 08:41:00 # Pages:61 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION 07/06/2015 08:41:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/22/2013 16:03:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 01/11/2013 09:29:00 DUPLICATE ORIGINAL - DEEMED ORIGINAL PER ORDER FILED 08/31/15. # Pages:13 |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 01/11/2013 | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 01/10/2013 15:41:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/10/2013 15:41:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/07/2013 14:20:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2012 | hearing | TRIAL | |
October 16, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 10/16/2012 08:00:00 # Pages:2 |
|
September 17, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT | |
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 09/17/2012 08:45:00 # Pages:2 |
|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT - PARENTING 09/17/2012 12:21:00 # Pages:3 |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE FOR MEDIATION 09/13/2012 14:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/23/2012 10:33:00 GENERATED BY THE TRIAL NOTICE # Pages:1 |
|
July 30, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 07/30/2012 09:00:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/30/2012 11:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | AT-ISSUE 07/30/2012 14:46:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/30/2012 08:31:00 # Pages:21 |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT 07/30/2012 08:29:00 # Pages:16 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - MOTION OR OPPOSITION 07/16/2012 15:36:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/16/2012 10:18:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 07/16/2012 10:17:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | OSC - OTHER 07/16/2012 10:16:00 # Pages:8 |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/14/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 06/14/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 06/14/2012 13:54:00 5C FEE WAIVER GRANTED-DH # Pages:5 | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 06/14/2012 13:38:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/14/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/14/2012 13:55:00 # Pages:2 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/30/2012 08:34:00 # Pages:1 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons 04/30/2012 08:34:00 # Pages:2 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/30/2012 08:34:00 # Pages:2 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/30/2012 08:32:00 # Pages:3 |
|