Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Garold C Brown Family vs. Anna Wajda
A 47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 case was filed by Garold C Brown Family Ltd Partnership, against Wajda, Anna, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Fain, Gregory presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Small Claims case referred to Mediation. Stipulated Judgment reached. Anna Wajda agrees to pay Garold C. Brown Family LTD a total of $642.72 plus court costs of $100.00, which totals $742.72. Anna agrees to make $50.00 payment a month commencing June 25, 2012 and continue on the 25th of each month until paid in full. If default occurs, a judgment will be enforced. Payments will be mailed to 1024 San Jose Avenue Clovis, CA 93612, payments will be made by cashier's check or money order. lmi Event: Referral to Mediation SC |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 23-MAY-2012 by LIRION. |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for plaintiff Stipulated Judgment: Court orders judgment entered on 5/23/12. Defendant Anna Wajda shall pay plaintiff Garold C Brown Family LTD Partnership, dba Gary Brown Construction $642.72 and $100.00 costs, total judgment $742.42 on plaintiff's claim. Anna Wajda agrees to pay Garold C. Brown Family LTD a total of $642.72 plus court costs of $100.00, which totals $742.72. Anna agrees to make $50.00 payment a month commencing June 25, 2012 and continue on the 25th of each month until paid in full. If default occurs, a judgment will be enforced. Payments will be mailed to 1024 San Jose Avenue Clovis, CA 93612, payments will be made by cashier's check or money order. lmi |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-MAY-2012 by LIRION. |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment SC Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 5/23/12 to All Parties. lmi |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Fain Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 08/41/48 Nature of Hearing: Small Claims Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Robyn Tesnear - Resident Manager Defendant: Anna Wajda Matter is referred to Mediation. Stipulated Judgment reached. Anna Wajda agrees to pay Garold C. Brown Family LTD a total of $642.72 plus court costs of $100.00, which totals $742.72. Anna agrees to make $50.00 payment a month commencing June 25, 2012 and continue on the 25th of each month until paid in full. If default occurs, a judgment will be enforced. Payments will be mailed to 1024 San Jose Avenue Clovis, CA 93612, payments will be made by cashier's check or money order. lmi |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Anna Wajda and filed. Cost $70.00. lmi |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 05/23/12 at 8:00am in Dept #1, Clovis Court. lmi Event: Pltf's claim & order filed |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim personal service Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . lmi |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$100.00 was made on receipt CLCL37811. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Auth to Appear on Behalf Party Authorization to Appear on behalf of Garold C. Brown Family LTD. Partnership, dba Gary Brown Construction filed by Robyn Tesnear on 5/23/12. lmi |