Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jan Bourret vs Comcast Corporation/DIS
A 47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 case was filed by Bourret, Jan, against Comcast Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by court Court orders action dismissed without prejudice . jy |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order Temporary Judge: Ty Kharazi Dismissed in court without prejudice due to non-appearances Dept.: 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter: 1/54/45 Nature of Hearing: Small Calims Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Not Present Defendant: Not Present jy |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 08-MAR-2012 by ZEYANG. |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Comcast Corporation CT Corporation System and filed. Cost $ 10.00 hf. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 03/08/12 at 01:30pm in Dept # 404. th. Event: Pltf's claim & order filed |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$40.00 was made on receipt SCCE56145. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pltf claim mailed cert mail Plaintiff's claim mailed to Comcast Coporation Inc. on 01/31 by certified mail, return receipt requested. th. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |