Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Maria Gomez Mendez vs Eduardo Mendez
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by Mendez, Maria Gomez, against Mendez, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Service of Judgment Served on Eduardo Mendez by mail on 7-12-13 th/7-30-13 |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: 2nd floor/FL microfilming shelf. 7/5/13 pkv | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Judgment of Dissolution signed 7/3/13. Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party. All other documents placed in runner box #1 for pick-up. 7/5/13 pkv |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Marital status ends: 9/16/13 Petitioner's former name is restored to: Maria Gomez-Aguirre 7/5/13 pkv |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution __x_ Legal Separation ___ 7/5/13 pkv Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. Marital status ends: 9/16/13 7/5/13 pkv | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:FLEX Shelf for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 4/22/13. mp 4/26/13 | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX to review Jgmt ms 4/19/13 | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Preliminary & Final jlm 04-16-13 |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Eduardo Mendez ms 4/19/13 | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Default for review Judgment attached jlm 04-16-13 | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Preliminary & Final |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-Summons filed Proof of service of Summons on Petition, Blk Response, Completed and blk Uccjea Served on Eduardo Mendez by mail on 3-13-13 completed and attached Ntc and Ack of Receipt signed on 3-15-13 th/3-21-13 |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice and acknowledge rcpt Notice and acknowledgement of receipt of Summons, Proof of service of Summons on Petition, Blk Response, Completed and blk Uccjea Served on Eduardo Mendez by mail on 3-13-13 completed and attached Ntc and Ack of Receipt signed on 3-15-13 th/3-21-13 |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Amd Pet Disso Marr w/children Summons Issued Yes ___ No ___ |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Uniform custody juris Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 9-15-12 to present with mother th/3-14-13 |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-summon def. Proof of service of Summons on Petition; Blank Response; Comp and blank UCCJEA; Comp and Blank Declaration of Disclosure; Comp and blank Schedule of Assets and Debts; Comp and blank IED filed showing defective service on Respondent -The person who signed the proof of service is not the person listed in item #5 . sms 01/30/13 |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of Service Certified mail attachment sms 01/30/13 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Uniform custody juris Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months San Joaquin, CA : and period of residence: jlm 12-03-12 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Summons Issued Yes __X_ No ___ jlm 12-03-12 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. jlm 12-03-12 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona jlm 12-03-12 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Fees Order signed Yes _X__ No ___ jlm 12-03-12 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration jlm 12-03-12 |