Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Heatheer Brown vs Clayton Johnson
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by Brown, Heather, against Johnson, Clayton, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case comment All conformed copies of granted default sent via mail in SASE to petnr ms 3/19/13 |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Clayton Johnson ms 3/19/13 | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Request for Default sent to default desk dc 3/15/13 |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Simplified Financial Statement ms 3/19/13 |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petnr'sPreliminary ms 3/19/13 |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-Summons filed Proof of service of petition, Summons, blank response with completed and blank uccjea, declaration of disclosure, schedule of assets & debts, and income & expense declaration filed showing service on Clayton Johnson by personal service on 11/1/12. dc 11/15/12 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Fees Order signed Yes _x__ No ___ hyg 10/31/12 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration hgy 10/31/12 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Uniform custody juris Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 10/03/06 to the present. hgy 10/31/12 |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Summons Issued Yes _x_ No ___ assigned to Judge RMD hgy 10/31/12 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. hgy 10/31/12 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona hgy 10/31/12 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |