Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Derek Chevalier vs Heather Chevalier
A Dissolution - No Children case was filed by Chevalier, Derek, against Chevalier, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
Dissolution - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
6 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date: Scanned Date: 2/12/13 ac 2/12/13 |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Void Payment Receipt Number FLCE174216 has been voided. |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Charmae Caracas for review of file due to wrong case type entered. 8-20-12 pkv | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: 2nd floor scanning shelf. Judgment of Dissolution and Notice of Entry of Judgment signed 8-16-12. The Judgment of Dissolution & Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party. 8-16-12 pkv | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Joint Disso Final Marital status ends: 8-16-12 The former name of Petitioner 2 is restored: Heather Ennis 8-16-12 pkv |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:Flex shelf for review of judgment. Date on shelf 07-24-12 cz 07-24-12 | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent Summary Jgmt disso marr to Flex ms 7/23/12 |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt FLCE174216. |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Preliminary dc 1/23/12 |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona dc 1/23/12 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Joint Petition Disso-No Fees correction made receipt #FLCE0174216 by credit card for $395.000 dc 8/21/12 |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) in propria persona dc 1/23/12 Event: Deft/Resp in Propria Persona |