Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deandria Green v Ernest Bennett
A Domestic Violence With Children case was filed by Green, Deandria, against Bennett, Ernest, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
Domestic Violence with Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dispo After Hearing by Court for jibsis purposes only ryk 4/20/12 |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
FCS Order Signed Family Court Services Order signed by Judge G. Allen-Hill . Granted _x___ Denied _____ Mediator: T. Roland ryk 4/25/12 |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Allen-Hill Minute Order from Dept.: 203 at 8:30 Clerk: R. Kim Reporter: G. Gregory Nature of Hearing: PROC Ptnr; Present/Pro Per REsp: Present/Pro Per Court orders family court services report and recommendation dated 3/23/12 is made the Order of the Court effective immediately. sole physical and legal custody of minor child to petitioner 3048 findings made and there is no risk of abduction ryk 4/20/12 |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Post Restraining Order Custody DV TRO Hrg on 2-8-12 at 830 am in dept 203 Set by Petitioner 12/392 sms-1-23-12 Judge: Allen-Hill, Glenda |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FCS court file tray. TR | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Dept 203 ao | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: TR mediation 3/20/12 bsl | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FCS for mediation tf 020912 | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause DV TRO Hrg on 2-8-12 at 830 am in dept 203 Set by Petitioner 12/392 sms-1-23-12 Judge: Allen-Hill, Glenda |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Allen-Hill Minute Order from Dept.: 203 Clerk: T. Flores Reporter: G. Gregory Nature of Hearing: OSC DV TRO Ptnr present pro per Resp present pro per Orientation: 2/17/12 @ 1:30(mom) 2/24/12 @1:30 (dad) Mediation: 3/20/12 at 8am(mom) 3/20/12 at 1pm (dad) Contd to: 4/17/12 at 8:30am in D203 Re: PROC Restrained Person: Ernest Bennett Protected Person: Deandria Green Restrained person must not: Harass, attack, strike, threaten, assault, hit follow, stalk, molest, detroy personal prop, disturb the peace, keep under surveillance, or block movements. Contact by telephone, send messages, or mail or email. Take any action, directly or through other, through others, to get the addresses or location of any protected persons or of their family members, caretakers, or guardians. The person restrained must stay 100 yards away from the protected persons home, vehicle, school, children's school, job or workplace The person protected has the right to record communications made by the person restrained that violate the judge's orders. Move Out Order: The person restrained must move out immediately from 3635 N. Pleasant Ave. #208. EXPIRES: 2/8/15 @ MIDNIGHT. TEMPORARY COURT ORDERS: Sole Physical and Sole Legal custody to Mother of minor child Eva DOB: 8/27/11. Respondent shall have visitation: Every Monday from 10am to 5pm. Exchange location: Maternal Grandmother's home. tf 020812 |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Restraining order after hrg expiration date 2/8/15 tf 020912 |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Notice of Court hearing; Request for DV Restraining Order; blank Response to Request for DV Restraining Order; TRO; Request for Child Custody and Visitation Orders; Child Custody and Visitation Order filed. Served on Ernest Bennett by personal service on 1/31/12. dc 2/1/12 |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Off calendar Calendared in Error sms-1-23-12 . |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona sms-1-23-12 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion sms-1-23-12 Event: App & Decl for Order |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence OSC DV TRO Hrg on 2-8-12 at 830 am in dept 203 Set by Petitioner 12/392 sms-1-23-12 |