Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Hazem Alhindi vs Aaron Arii/DISM
A 22 Unlimited - Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Smith, Bruce presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. Smith, Bruce
Category
22 Unlimited - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
8 months and 11 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 4 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. gar | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Entire action dismissed with prejudice. dhouston Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for trial readiness scheduled for 6/21/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for settlement conference scheduled for 5/30/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for jury trial scheduled for 6/24/13. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury fees posted for Ashley Mariemelton Arii by Michael Czeshinski. sg | |
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$300.00 was made on receipt CVCE168043. |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury fees posted for Aaron Jon Arii by Michael Czeshinski. sg | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 18-APR-2012 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 6/11/12. Trial dates set. Stipulation to trial setting in lieu of CMC filed. db | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury requested by both/all Jury requested by both plaintiff and defendant/all parties. db |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation - Mediation ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee M. Jacobson, Esq. db |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Trial Setting Case Management Conference taken off calendar. Estimated time for trial: 5-7 days Mandatory Settlement Conference date: 5/30/13 at 10:00 in Room 575 Trial Readiness date: 6/21/13 at 9:30 in Dept 503 Trial date: 6/24/13 at 9:00 in Dept 503 db |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE162917. |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to Complaint filed. (gac) |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE162658. |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to Complaint filed. dhouston |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Ashley Mariemelton ARII on 2/15/2012 . le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Ashley Arii-Wife , mailed on 2/16/2012 . le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of reasonable diligence filed. le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of diligence filed. le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of reasonable diligence filed. le |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Ashley Arii-Wife , mailed on 2/16/2012 . le |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Appointment guardian ad litem Petition and order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem appointing Heather D.Thomas as guardian ad litem for minor Landyn Yang signed by Judge M. Bruce Smith on 2-2-12 . (gac) |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Appointment guardian ad litem Petition and order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem appointing Heather D. Thomas as guardian ad litem for minor Dylan Yang signed by Judge M. Bruce on 2-2-12 . (gac) |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE161205. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Assignment of Judge Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 31-JAN-2012 by SAMGARCIA. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 31-JAN-2012 by SAMGARCIA. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |