Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Daimlerchrysler Financial Services Americas LLC vs Michael S Humphrey
An Unlimited Other Collections (09) case was filed by Daimlerchrysler Financial Services Americas Llc, represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Humphrey, Michael S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Brown, James W presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 27, 2007
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Category
Unlimited Other Collections (09)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit, Filed | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |