Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRUECK, BRIAN CHARLES vs KAY M WALKER FKA M KAY SLAYDEN TRUSTEE OF THE SLAYDEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST UTD OCTOBER 19, 1995
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. Judge MERCURIO, FREDERICK P presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Sarasota County, FL
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal action filed by Brian Charles Brueck against Kay M. Walker, the trustee of the Slayden Family Living Trust. The purpose of the complaint is to quiet title to a property located in Sarasota County, Florida. The plaintiff …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: Nov 19, 2018JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018151583)
Date: Nov 19, 2018REQUEST FOR COMPULSORY JUDICAL NOTICE
Date: Nov 08, 2018MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 30, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Oct 30, 2018REQUEST - FOR COMPULSORY JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: Oct 30, 2018PAYMENT 410.00 RECEIPT 2018100217
Date: Oct 03, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Oct 02, 2018LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018131067)
Date: Oct 02, 2018COMPLAINT REAL PROP 50,000 OR LESS
Date: Oct 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018151583) | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COMPULSORY JUDICAL NOTICE | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST - FOR COMPULSORY JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 19 2018 1:30PM JUDGE: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P LOCATION: JACS | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - KAY M WALKER FKA M KAY SLAYDEN TRUSTEE OF THE SLAYDEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST UTD OCTOBER 19, 1995 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KAY M WALKER FKA M KAY SLAYDEN TRUSTEE OF THE SLAYDEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST UTD OCTOBER 19, 1995 | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - KAY M WALKER F/K/A M KAY SLAYDEN TRUSTEE OF THE SLAYDEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST UDT OCTOBER 19 1995 | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018100217 | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018131067) | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KAY M WALKER FKA KAY SLAYDEN TRUSTEE OF THE SLAYDEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST UDT OCTOBER 19 1995 - ISSUED 10/03/2018 |