Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. LOPEZ, JOSEPH
On March 22, 2023 a homestead mf $50,001-$249,999 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL. Judge SCHWAB, CHARLES A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 22, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 08, 2024
Filing Location
St. Lucie County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Circuit Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY
Date: Nov 20, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING
Date: Sep 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Aug 10, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY
Date: Jul 14, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE
Date: Jun 20, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Jun 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE
Date: Jun 13, 2023DEFAULT
Date: May 01, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: Apr 28, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: Apr 28, 2023DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK
Date: Apr 28, 2023MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 27, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: Apr 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED
Date: Apr 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED
Date: Apr 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: Apr 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Apr 10, 2023LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.4967.131. / 5171290)
Date: Mar 28, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: Mar 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - JOSEPH LOPEZ
Date: Mar 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - LISA M. LOPEZ
Date: Mar 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE
Date: Mar 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: Mar 24, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 22, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: Mar 22, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Mar 22, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Mar 22, 2023VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY
Date: Mar 22, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: Mar 22, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: Mar 22, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 09/21/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK LETTER OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL NOTICE | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: HAMILTON, HOLLIS ROSE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023CA001248, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS. LOPEZ, JOSEPH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NCICL-6/15/2023,NCINC-6/15/2023" | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING-COPY OF NOTE/ MTGE | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: HAMILTON, HOLLIS ROSE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023CA001248, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS. LOPEZ, JOSEPH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-5/1/2023" | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.4967.131. / 5171290) | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - JOSEPH LOPEZ | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - LISA M. LOPEZ | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: HAMILTON, HOLLIS ROSE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023CA001248, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS. LOPEZ, JOSEPH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 5 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/24/2023" | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $961.00 RECEIPT #2023000025406 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 169413530 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230324235959.TXT. | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/22/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA001248 | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: HAMILTON, HOLLIS ROSE ASSIGNED |