Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LLC DBA WILSHIRE CONSUMER CREDIT vs SNYDER, KELLY A
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL. Judge ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 03, 2023
Filing Location
St. Lucie County, FL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE
Date: Aug 09, 2022ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE - RECORDED (OTHER.4871.704. / 5081608)
Date: Aug 09, 2022ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: Aug 09, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Aug 08, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: Jul 15, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jul 01, 2022NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS
Date: Jul 01, 2022NOTICE
Date: Jun 29, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Jun 29, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 29, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jun 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE - RECORDED (OTHER.4871.704. / 5081608) | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/12/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: ALVAREZ, MELISSA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022SC002167, WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LLC DBA WILSHIRE CONSUMER CREDIT VS. SNYDER, KELLY A - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/1/2022" | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ALVAREZ, MELISSA ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WINTER, ROBERT ADAM ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000051073 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 152453071 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220701235959.TXT. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/08/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 06/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC002167 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |