Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
3625 PLEASANT ACRES ROAD, LLC vs RAPID RECOVERY AGENCY, INC. et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL. Judge Robert E. Belanger presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 06, 2023
Filing Location
St. Lucie County, FL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jul 01, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 29, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Jun 29, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jun 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: GLICKMAN, GARRY MARC - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022CA001177, 3625 PLEASANT ACRES ROAD, LLC VS. RAPID RECOVERY AGENCY, INC. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/1/2022" | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 06/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001177 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GLICKMAN, GARRY MARC ASSIGNED |