Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JAMES, TYSON WHEELER
A Rpoa - Risk Protection Order Act case was filed by Polk County Sheriff'S Office, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL. Judge 31 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 03, 2024
Filing Location
Polk County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. 31 JAMES A YANCEY
Category
RPOA - RISK PROTECTION ORDER ACT
Case Outcome Type
Open
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING MEMO (COURT PROGRESS REPORT) | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR RISK PROTECTION ORDER (DOES REQ TEMP EX PARTE) | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 06/11/2024 02:00 PM | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 05/30/2024 02:00 PM |