Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TARPON SPRINGS HOUSING AUTHORITY Vs. KALENA P WARREN
On November 26, 2014 a delinquent tenant - county case was filed by Tarpon Springs Housing Authority, represented by Daniel G Drake, against Warren, Kalena P, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL. Judge FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 26, 2014
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Pinellas County, FL
Category
DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by the Tarpon Springs Housing Authority (Plaintiff) against Kalena P. Warren (Defendant) for eviction from a property in Pinellas County, Florida. The Plaintiff owns the property located at 720-A Mango Cir…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Date: Jan 08, 2015ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY
Date: Dec 23, 2014DEF-RESPS EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT - DENIED
Date: Dec 22, 2014EXHIBIT 1 COPIES OF TIME SHEETS FOR SCHOOL ATTENDANCE
Date: Dec 22, 2014WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 12/19/14
Date: Dec 19, 2014DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Date: Dec 18, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18627, Page 76, 1 pages
Date: Dec 18, 2014VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: Dec 10, 2014NOTICE OF FILING THE VERIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: Dec 10, 2014EXHIBIT DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE MANPOWER STATUS REPORT
Date: Dec 10, 2014SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 120214 KALENA P. WARREN
Date: Dec 10, 2014PLTF-PETS MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: Dec 10, 2014ANSWER OF Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Date: Dec 05, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Date: Dec 01, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 26, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: Nov 26, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: Nov 26, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: Nov 26, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT - DENIED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT '1' COPIES OF TIME SHEETS FOR SCHOOL ATTENDANCE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 12/19/14
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18627, Page 76, 1 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING THE VERIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE MANPOWER STATUS REPORT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 120214 KALENA P. WARREN
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER TO PROCESS SERVER/MARK-APPLIED Party: WARREN, KALENA P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |