Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SRS DISTRIBUTION INCVs.INTEGRITY ROOFING AND GUTTERS INC, et al
On November 26, 2014 a contracts and indebtedness - circuit case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL. Judge MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 26, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Pinellas County, FL
Category
CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONFOR PAYMENT | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGSTIP | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING STIP
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENTSUMMONS | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS011415 CHANTELLE A. FERNANDEZ | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT SUMMONS
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 011415 CHANTELLE A. FERNANDEZ
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTEREDParty: INTEGRITY ROOFING AND GUTTERS INC | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: INTEGRITY ROOFING AND GUTTERS INC
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULTDEFAULT ENTERED 012115 | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 012115
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENTSUMMONS | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS122214 INTEGRITY ROOFING & GUTTERS, INC | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT SUMMONS
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 122214 INTEGRITY ROOFING & GUTTERS, INC
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBITCREDIT APPLICATION | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUEDISSUED ON 11/26/14 | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBITSTOP PAYMENT CHECK | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBITSTATEMENT | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 11/26/14
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT STOP PAYMENT CHECK
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT CREDIT APPLICATION
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT STATEMENT
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |