Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TYRONE PLACE APARTMENTS LLC Vs. MARGARET COLLINS
On May 30, 2014 a delinquent tenant - county case was filed by Tyrone Place Apartments Llc, represented by Brian P Wolk, against Collins, Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL. Judge FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 30, 2014
Last Refreshed
January 14, 2021
Filing Location
Pinellas County, FL
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Fullerton, Walter;Category
DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 06/24/14
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18440, Page 538, 1 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: COLLINS, MARGARET
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 061314
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 060314 MARGARET COLLINS
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: COLLINS, MARGARET
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED 06/02/14
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT 3 DAY NOTICE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |