Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBERTS, KARI ANN
On June 22, 2021 a 3 case was filed against Kari Ann Roberts, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Sherri L. Collins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
3
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: Jun 22, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT P: Cnty Crim - P (County) |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION SHEET | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT E: Cnty Crim - E (County) |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR AR - ARRAIGNMENT 8/6/2021 8:45 AM Collins, Sherri L AR - ARRAIGNMENT 8/6/2021 8:45 AM Collins, Sherri L |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRANSFERRED FROM CASE # 50-2021-CF-005155-AXXX-MB 50-2021-CF-005155-AXXX-MB |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION FILED 893.147(1B) POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA (USE) 893.147(1B) |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DRIVING RECORD REQUEST SUBMITTED TO DHSMV | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST RECORD | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
893.13(6A) POSS. OF COCAINE 893.13(6A) |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT U: Felony - U (Circuit) |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | 893.147(1) POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
893.13(6A) POSS. CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE 893.13(6A) |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DRIVING RECORD REQUEST SUBMITTED TO DHSMV | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND SET AT COURT ORDERED SOR IV Court Ordered SOR IV |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | $50.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND . . | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CROSS REFERENCE LIST | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NO ALCOHOL/ILLEGAL DRUGS/NON PRESCRIPTION DRUGS WITH RANDOM TESTING | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | AUTH FOR COURT DATE REMINDER TEXT MESSAGE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 6/22/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 6/22/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 07/22/2021 8:30 AM STF - STATE TO FILE CHARGES 7/22/2021 8:30 AM STF - STATE TO FILE CHARGES VOLKER, JUDGEKIRK |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FOUND INDIGENT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT AND IN CUSTODY | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | 7 DAYS TO PAY DUE BY 6/29/2021 |