Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RODRIGUEZ, ALEXANDER
A case was filed against Alexander Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge John J. Parnofiello presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 01, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 13, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSSE W/RESCISSION OF NO CONTACT ORDER ON COUNT | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION AGREEMENT | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSSE | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STATE ANNOUNCED NOLLE PROSSE STATE ANNOUNCED NOLLE PROSSE | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL DIVERSION | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | UPSIDE IMPOSED UPSIDE IMPOSED | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE TO FOLLOW WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE TO FOLLOW | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATED PLEA | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4468445 $100.00 4468445 Fully Paid |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING HELD VIA ZOOM | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled SENT - SENTENCING on 6/6/2022 8:30:00 AM due to | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 05/20/2022 8:30 AM SENT - SENTENCING 5/20/2022 8:30 AM SENT - SENTENCING |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled STCK - STATUS CHECK on 10/4/2021 9:30:00 AM due to | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR STCK - STATUS CHECK 10/4/2021 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D STCK - STATUS CHECK 10/4/2021 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR SENT - SENTENCING 6/6/2022 8:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D SENT - SENTENCING 6/6/2022 8:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled SENT - SENTENCING on 5/30/2022 9:30:00 AM due to SET IN ERROR | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AND PASS | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF RIGHTS | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCISSION NO CONTACT ORD | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | 273 DAYS TO PAY DUE BY 5/31/2022 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 05/30/2022 9:30 AM SENT - SENTENCING 5/30/2022 9:30 AM SENT - SENTENCING |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | $100.00 COST OF PROSECUTION | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 10/04/2021 9:30 AM STCK - STATUS CHECK 10/4/2021 9:30 AM STCK - STATUS CHECK SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SPANISH INTERPRETER PRESENT SPANISH | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT, SWORN AND TESTIFIED, AND ADVISED OF RIGHTS | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 08/30/2021 8:30 AM STCK - STATUS CHECK 8/30/2021 8:30 AM STCK - STATUS CHECK |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 07/19/2021 9:30 AM CD - CASE DISPOSITION 7/19/2021 9:30 AM CD - CASE DISPOSITION SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOT GUILTY PLEA | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled AR - ARRAIGNMENT on 6/28/2021 1:00:00 PM due to | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw - Granted - PD | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR AR - ARRAIGNMENT 6/28/2021 1:00 PM SURBER, MELANIE D AR - ARRAIGNMENT 6/28/2021 1:00 PM SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | REMAINS AS PREVIOUSLY SET | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DVRV HEARING ADDRESSED DVRV HEARING ADDRESSED | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR STCK - STATUS CHECK 6/21/2021 2:00 PM SURBER, JUDGEMELANIE D STCK - STATUS CHECK 6/21/2021 2:00 PM SURBER, JUDGEMELANIE D |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRESENCE OF DEFT | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ADD ATTORNEY 100371 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED 784.03(1) BATTERY (DOMESTIC) | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION SHEET | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT CONDITIONS SUPERVISION | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AUTH FOR COURT DATE REMINDER TEXT MESSAGE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NO CONTACT | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CROSS REFERENCE LIST | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 6/1/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 6/1/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT AND IN CUSTODY | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED PER COURT PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | STAND IN ATTORNEY B.POULTON ASA PRESENT B.POULTON ASA | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 06/28/2021 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT 6/28/2021 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT SURBER, MELANIE D |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DATE NOTICES SENT | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND SET AT COURT ORDERED SOR IV Court Ordered SOR IV |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND . . | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SPANISH INTERPRETER PRESENT SPANISH | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT P: Cnty Crim - P (County) |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
784.03(1A1) DOMESTIC BATTERY 784.03(1A1) |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST RECORD | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT DVTD: Dom Battery & DVRV Inj Hearings - DVTD (County) |