Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DESANTIS, EVA GERLINDE
On August 31, 2021 a formal administration case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Sarah L. Willis presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
FORMAL ADMINISTRATION
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP S/B JUDGE WILLIS DTD 11/19/2021 |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 33090 PAGE 1808-1808 S/B JUDGE WILLIS DTD 11/19/2021 |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT "ORIGINAL" F/B ATTY |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT "ORIGINAL" F/B ATTY |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil) |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4161153 $401.00 4161153 Fully Paid |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B VICTOR DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT F/B VICTOR DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS F/B VICTOR DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT F/B RAMONA DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION F/B PETR, VICTOR DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT COPY F/B PETR |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT F/B JOHANNA DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT F/B VICTOR DESANTIS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT F/B NICHOLAS DESANTIS |