Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ECHOLS, BARRY DEAN
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Sarah L. Willis presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 16, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: HARRIS, ADELE SMALL | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner: EGBY, JEANINE M | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISCHARGE BOOK 33253 PAGE 1485-1486 S/B JUDGE CARACUZZO DTD 01/19/2022 |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROBATE CHECKLIST PROBATE CHECK LIST |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISCHARGE PETITION FORDISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER - SINGLE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE) |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF SALE PROCEEDS FROM THE KARP LAW FIRM TO THE PR OF THE ESTATE SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIS ON DEC 8, 2021 AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF SALE PROCEEDS FROM THE KARP LAW FIRM TO THE PR OF THE ESTATE SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIS ON DEC 8, 2021 |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/STMNT RE: CREDITORS STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS (INDIVIDUAL) |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER - FULL ESTATE WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF SALE PROCEEDS FROM THE KARP LAW FIRM, PA. | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY F/B PR |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY - ESTATE F/B JEANINE EGBY |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY EXT. UNTIL 12/31/21 S/B JDG S. WILLIS DTD 10/27/21 |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $4.00 ON RECEIPT 4199678 $4.00 4199678 Fully Paid |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER AUTH SALE OF REAL PROP BOOK 32914 PAGE 513-514 JDG S WILLIS DTD 9/24/21 |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO SELL REAL PROPERTY F.B PR |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION THE PALM BEACH POST |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $15.00 ON RECEIPT 4165140 $15.00 4165140 Fully Paid |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32837 PAGE 1495-1495 AMENDED - FOR JEANINE M EGBY; JUDGE SARAH WILLIS - DTD 8/27/2021. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO CREDITORS DOP 8/28/2021 F/B PR |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32833 PAGE 769-769 S/B JDG S. WILLIS DTD 08/26/21 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT "ORIGINAL" F/B ATTY |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4144380 $401.00 4144380 Fully Paid |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil) |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE F/B PET |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP F/B JEANINE M. EGBY |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT F/B JEANINE M. EGBY E-FILED |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT F/B JEANINE M. EGBY |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION F/B JEANINE M. EGBY |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
OATH OF PERS REP & DESIG & ACCEPT OF RES AGENT DESIG ADELE SMALL HARRIS, ESQ. F/B JEANINE M. EGBY |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION F/B JEANINE M. EGBY |