Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LEITNER, ANITA R
On June 18, 2021 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge SAMANTHA SCHOSBERG_FEUER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Judge
Hon. SAMANTHA SCHOSBERG_FEUER
Category
3
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROBATE CHECKLIST PROBATE DIVISION |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUNTNG AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B ATTY KLEINMAN |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUNTING & PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B ATTY KLEINMAN OF FINAL ACCOUNTING & PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B ATTY KLEINMAN |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL ACCOUNTING - ESTATE F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING F/B ATTY KLEINMAN |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION IA ORDER DIRECTING CLERK & COMPTROLLER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DIVISION "IA" (OTIA) GLENN D. KELLEY 07/25/2022 |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION/RELEASE OF CLAIM SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY - ESTATE F/B PR |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/STMNT RE: CREDITORS F/B PR |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING INFORMATION WITHIN COURT F/B PR |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM F/B SENIOR NANNIES HOME CARE SERVICES LLC NOTIFIED ATTY |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS ON THE AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO CREDITORS DOP JUNE 28, 2021 F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $9.00 ON RECEIPT 4111233 $9.00 4111233 Fully Paid |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REP JDG D KEEVER-AGRAMA DTD 7/12/21 |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32691 PAGE 1010-1010 JDG D KEEVER-AGRAMA DTD 7/12/21 |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT "ORIGINAL" F/B ATTY |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT IH: North Branch Probate, MH, Guardianship - IH (Civil) |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4075512 $401.00 4075512 Fully Paid |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
WILL BOOK 32691 PAGE 774-779 ORIGINAL |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
OATH OF P.R., DESIG. R/A & ACCPT. DESIG. ROBERT S. KLEINMAN, ESQ. F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT F/B SUSAN ROTKER E-FILED |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION F/B SUSAN ROTKER |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING F/B ATTY. KLEINMAN |