Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GAMBARDELLA, DONALD
On June 01, 2021 a summary administration <$1000 case was filed by Gina Puder, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge LAURA LAURIE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 01, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Judge
Hon. LAURA LAURIE
Category
SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION <$1000
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM F/B JFK MEDICAL CENTER 07/27/21 E-SERVED ATTY. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 32672 PAGE 1965-1966 JDG L LAURIE DTD 7/6/21 |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32673 PAGE 1-2 JDG L LAURIE DTD 7/6/21 |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: HALPERIN, BRETT | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner: PUDER, GINA | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FUNERAL BILL | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS GINA PUDER |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATUS ORDER DTD 06/23/21 S/B JDG LAURIE |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT ORIGINAL OF DONALD GAMBARDELLA |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $236.00 ON RECEIPT 4050939 $236.00 4050939 Fully Paid |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil) |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT F/B GINA PUDER |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN F/B GINA PUDER |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY F/B GINA PUDER |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT & JOINDER F/B GINA PUDER |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT E-FILED F/B GINA PUDER |