Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AKINS, TANISHA V DHANASSAR, DEVIKA
On August 17, 2021 an auto negligence case was filed by Tanisha Akins, against Devika Dhanassar, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Bradley G. Harper presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I — NEGLIGENCE — DEVIKA DHANASSAR
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Tanisha Akins against Devika Dhanassar. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $30,000. Tanisha Akins is a resident of Riviera Beach, Palm Beach County, Florida, while Devika Dhanassar is also a resident…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Oct 26, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: Aug 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Aug 17, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 17, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Aug 17, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: Aug 17, 2021PAID 411.00 ON RECEIPT 4143515
Date: Aug 17, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Aug 17, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Aug 17, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (F/B PLT) |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE DEVIKA DHANASSAR - 08/20/2021 |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS TO DEFENDANT DEVIKA DHANASSAR F/B PLT |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF TANISHA AKINS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DEVIKA DHANASSAR F/B PLT |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4143515 $411.00 4143515 Fully Paid |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED tracy@geeandlee.com;t_mcduffie3@yahoo.com ISSUED TO DEVIKA DHANASSAR EFILED |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DEVIKA DHANASSAR F/B PLT |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil) |