Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TOWNSEND, LONNIE V HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE
On June 22, 2021 a contract & debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Jaimie R. Goodman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
CONTRACT & DEBT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Lonnie Townsend against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that they are the owner of a property located in Delray Beach, Florida, and that they had a valid insurance pol…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: Apr 19, 2022RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Apr 13, 2022NOTICE DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: Apr 13, 2022ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: Apr 13, 2022NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: Feb 10, 2022ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: Jan 31, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: Jan 10, 2022SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: Jan 05, 2022AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: Dec 22, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: Dec 17, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: Dec 16, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 16, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Sep 29, 2021ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Sep 17, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: Sep 10, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: Aug 18, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: Aug 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: Aug 03, 2021PAID 411.00 ON RECEIPT 4080187
Date: Jun 25, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Jun 24, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jun 24, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Jun 24, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 24, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: Jun 24, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jun 22, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE F/B ATTY BERGES OBO PLT |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN GOODMAN DTD 1/31/22: DEMAND FOR JURY AND THIS CASE IS DESIGNATED TO THE GENERAL TRACK FOR TIME TO DISPOSITION UNLESS ALL DFT HAVE BEEN DEFAULTED AND OR DROPPED IF DFT'S ARE NOT DEFAULTED THIS CASE WILL BE RESOLVED W/IN 12 MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES WILL BE OBSERVED ** SEE ORDER ** NOTICE FOR TRIAL IS REQUIRED PARTIES DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTIE FOR TRIAL W/IN 10 DAYS |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S FIELD ADJUSTER PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310 FIELD ADJUSTER ON BEHALF OF HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. 04/19/2022 10:00:00 AM | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ISSUED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM LEE VORCHEIMER |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC 04/14/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (COORDINATED WITH COUNSEL) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF THURSDAY 04/14/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DFTS ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE F/B PLT |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFT |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B DFTS |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER JGOODMAN DTD 8/19/21 ON DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTS COMPLAINT -GRANTED JGOODMAN DTD 8/19/21 ON DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTS COMPLAINT -GRANTED |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS 124137, 124137, 1010469, 1010469 |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4080187 $411.00 4080187 Fully Paid |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil) |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED oberges@alliancelawfirm.org;eservice@alliancelawfirm.org ISSUED TO HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. EFILED |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |