Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PORRAS, IVAN V VERDOLIVA, SEBASTIAN T
On December 05, 2013 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Meenu T. Sasser presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 27722 PAGE 799
Date: Jul 30, 2015STIPULATION
Date: Jul 30, 2015ORDER VACATING
Date: Jun 12, 2015ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 27603 PAGE 1810
Date: Jun 12, 2015RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: May 28, 2015NOTICE
Date: May 28, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: May 21, 2015PRETRIAL STIPULATION
Date: May 15, 2015MEDIATION REPORT
Date: May 13, 2015REQUEST
Date: May 01, 2015NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: May 01, 2015REQUEST
Date: May 01, 2015NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: May 01, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: Apr 30, 2015DISCLOSURE
Date: Apr 28, 2015NOTICE
Date: Apr 28, 2015WITNESS LIST
Date: Apr 23, 2015NOTICE OF INTENT
Date: Apr 14, 2015DISCLOSURE
Date: Apr 10, 2015NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: Apr 09, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: Mar 20, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: Mar 16, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: Feb 23, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: Dec 19, 2014RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 02, 2014RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 02, 2014NOTICE
Date: Dec 02, 2014NOTICE
Date: Dec 02, 2014RESPONSE TO:
Date: Dec 01, 2014MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: Nov 12, 2014ORDER
Date: Oct 23, 2014ORDER
Date: Oct 06, 2014MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: Oct 01, 2014RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Jul 14, 2014NOTICE
Date: Jul 14, 2014ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 21, 2014REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Jan 09, 2014REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 17, 2013ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Dec 17, 2013REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 05, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 05, 2013REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Dec 05, 2013NOTICE
Date: Dec 05, 2013NOTICE
Date: Dec 05, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SATISFACTION OF LIEN. F/B ATTY MILLER OBO LIENHOLDER Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 27722 PAGE 799 THAT CAUSE DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. DTD 7/30/15 Meenu Sasser |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED 6-12-15. DTD 6-12-15 M SASSER ** NOT RECORDED PURSUANT TO NON COMPLIANCE W/RJA 2.520 *** |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 27603 PAGE 1810 DTD 6/12/15 M SASSER |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM FILED BY GREGORY P HUBER Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE -DENIED MSASSER 6/2/15 |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE F/B SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLVIA AND THE BRICKMAN GROUP RESPONSE TO PLT'S EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REGARDING WILLIAM E. LEE III PH.D.P.E. Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE F/B DFT SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA AND BRICKMAN GROUP NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLT'S EXPERT INTERROG REGARDING WILLIAM E. LEE, III, PH.D., P.E Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE 6/2/15 8:45 AM FILED BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN. Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL F/B DFTS Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT OF CLIENT F/B DFTS Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRETRIAL STIPULATION PRETRIAL.STIPULATION Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT THE OUTCOME WAS: IMPASSE |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA UNDER RULE 1.351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION F/B DFT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA AND THE BRICKMAN GROUP, LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS REGARDING RETAINED EXPERT, NEIL A. SCHECHTER, M.D Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS, REGARDING RETAINED EXPERT, NEIL A. SCHECHTER, M.D Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS REGARDING RETAINED EXPERT, WILLIAM E. LEE, III, PH.DCP,E Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS, REGARDING RETAINED EXPERT, WILLIAM E. LEE, III, PH.D., P.E Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY IVAN PORRAS Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA AND BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS, DR. IRVING U. OJALVO, FROM DEFTS' EXPERT WITNESS LIST FILED BY SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA AND BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS FILED BY DFTS ATTY LUNDEEN Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN. Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE EXPERT WITNESS. F/B DEFTS SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA AND THE BRICKMAN GROUP Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION MAY 13, 2015 10:00 AM - 12:00 PM F/B RODNEY G ROMANO, ESQ |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: DEFTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: F/B PLT RESPONSE TO NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION NEIL SCHECHTER M.D. 4/28/2015 (F/B PLT) Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER PLTT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE EXPERT WITNESS FEE AND PAYMENT PROCEDURE IS GRANTED (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) 3/12/2015 M SASSER A |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDER RULE 1.351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION FILED BY BRICKMAN GROUP AND SEBASTIAN VERDOLIVA Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA UNDER RULE 1.351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION F/B DFT SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA AND THE BRICKMAN GROUP, LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DETERMINE EXPERT WITNESS FEE AND PAYMENT PROCEDURE FB PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 22,2015 8:45AM COURTROOM 9-D FB PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. GRANTED. THIS CASE IS CONTINUED TO THE MAY DOCKET. M. SASSER ON 3/4/15 | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION PROCEDURES. SET FOR JURY TRIAL FOR THE MAY, 2015 DOCKET. THE TRIAL PERIOD IS JUNE 1, 2015 THROUGH JUNE 26, 2015. M. SASSER ON 3/3/15 | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING MONDAY, MARCH 3, 2015 AT 9:00 A.M. COURTROOM 9D - F/B DFT Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE F/B DFT VERDOLIVA AMD THE BRICKMAN GROUP Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT OF CLIENT F/B DFTS Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/09/15 @ 9:00AM F/B DFTS Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE F/B PLTS ATTORNEY Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION E-FILED BY DEFT Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION IVAN PORRAS FEBRUARY 4, 2015 AT 11:00 A.M FILED BY DFTS Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST F/B IVAN PORRAS Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: RESPONSE OF PLTF TO NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDBR RULE 1.351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION FILED BY MITCHELL LUNDEEN Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN. Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL THIS ACTION IS SET FUR JURY TRIAL FOR THE TRIAL PERIOD OF MARCH 30, 2015 THROUGH MAY 8, 2015. DIVISION "AI" HAS ADOPTED AN E-CALENDAR CALL. YOU MUST COMPLY WITH THE INSTRUCTIONS FOR E-CALENDAR CALL AS LISTED ON EXHIBIT "A" (M SASSER) |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL 3/30/15 - 5/8/15. Meenu Sasser |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFT SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFT THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFENDANT, SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFT THE BRICKMAN GROUP, LTD, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA UNDER RULE 1.351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION F/B/DEFT THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: RESPONSE TO NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND REOUEST FOR COPIES F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION LIEN FILED BY ADAM MILLER | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDER RULE 1 351 FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION FILED BY DFTS ATTY MITCHELL LUNDEEN Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN. Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ON 11/25/14 AT 8:45AM; F/B GREGORY P HUBER Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SEBASATIAN T.VERDOLIVA ON 12/09/14 @ 10:30AM FILED O/B/O IVAN PORRAS Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL -GRANTED MSASSER |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL F/B PLT UP 10/27/14 Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. M SASSER DTD 10/3/14 | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL F\B PLTF- DFTS, SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA AND THE BRICKMAN GROUP, LTD, LLC, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, BRICKMAN'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OBO IVAN PORRAS Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ANSWERING DEFENDANT BRICKMAN'S INTERROGATORIES OBO IVAN PORRAS Filed by ATTORNEY GREGORY P HUBER |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DFT SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SVD SUMMONS THE BRICKMAN GROUP 12/9/13- NO SUMMONS ATTACHED Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SVD SUMMONS ON SEBASTIAN VERDOLIVA 12/17/13- NO SUMMONS ATTACHED Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINITFF FILED BY THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE NOTICE OF SERVING AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN Filed by ATTORNEY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$421.00 was made on receipt CAMB848176. Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT THE BRICKMAN GROUP, L.D.T., L.L.C F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP, L.T.D., L. L.C F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SEBASTIAN T. VERDOLIVA SM-13-110084 Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN T VERDOLIVA |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BRICKMAN GROUP L.T. D. L.L.C SM-13-110083 Filed by DEFENDANT BRICKMAN GROUP LTD LLC |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF IVAN PORRAS |