Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KOPROVICH, LYNN DELE V COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP
On January 28, 2008 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 28, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Lynn Dele Koprivich, individually and as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gregory Lee Koprivich, against Community Asphalt Corp. and Jorge Luis Lopez Erbiti. The complaint alleges that on December 21, 2006, …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: Dec 31, 2008RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Jul 09, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: Jun 30, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: Jun 23, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: Jun 23, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: Jun 12, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: May 27, 2008NOTICE
Date: May 12, 2008NOTICE
Date: Apr 28, 2008RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: Apr 21, 2008RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: Feb 27, 2008MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: Feb 22, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Jan 28, 2008NOTICE
Date: Jan 28, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 28, 2008NOTICE
Date: Jan 28, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Jan 28, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL CLOSE FILE K STERN |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED AFTER HEARING Associated to docket STOR filed on 2008-12-31 |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC OF CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROG Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC OF ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF THE PALM BEACHES Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED RC OF CHARLES GOVER Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC OF ALEXANDER GOLDMAN Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED TO SEAN DEVRIEND |
|
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RIVIERA BEACH FIRE RESCUE DEPT |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED SEAN DEVRIEND |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DENISE HYDE |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED UNITED TECHNOLOGIES |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED PALM BEACH GARDENS OPEN IMAGING |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR JACK WATERMAN |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED CLEVELAND CLINIC |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFT MOT TO STRIKE & PLTF CLAIM FOR ATTY FEES IS STRICKEN KSTERN |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VACATION Filed by ATTORNEY GARY RUSSO |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROG Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROG Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO CONTENTION INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO CONTENTION INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION LYNN DELE KPORIVICH |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: OF DEFTS TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION & INCORPORATED WORK PRODUCT PRIVILEGE LOG |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGS Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROG Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO CONTENTION INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROG Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO CONTENTION INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED STUART GRAHAM Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC/HARTFORD LIFE & ACCIDENT INS CO C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC/CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INS CO. C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC/NERCURY INS CO OF FLORIDA C/O INS COMM |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED RC/NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INS CO C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY RIVIERA BEACH FIRE RESCUE DEPT, ETC Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE BY DFTS OF NO OBJECTION TO PALM BEACH GARDENS OPEN IMAGING |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SEAN DEVRIEND AND DENISE HYDE Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2ND) OF LYNN DELE KOPROVICH Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF STUART GRAHAM Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR GARY PEPPER |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED FL OPEN IMIPAGING |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF FL INC |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR RODNEY HERMAN |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED PROFESSIONAL THERAPEUTICS INC |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR CRAIG LICHTBLAU |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED PALM BEACH GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR GARY ALLEGRETTI |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED DR RICHARD FARO |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED PRATT & WHITNEY |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED GARDENS RADIOLOGY ASSOC |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED GARDENS PAIN CLINIC |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED NORTH PALM BEACH NEUROSURGERY |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY PALM BEACH GARDENS OPEN IMAGING Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE BY DFTS OF NO OBJECTION |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERGS Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LYNN DALE KOPRIVICH |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ANDREAS BERNHARD Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING 06-05-2008 @ 8:45 A.M. Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JORGE ERBITI |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH & REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OFFICER FRANK BRAY |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO INTERROGATORY Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPROVICH |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AS TO DFTS, WITH ATTACHMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AS TO BOTH DFTS, COMMUNITY ASPHALT AND JORGE ERBITI SHALL ANSWER INTERROGS, CONTENTION INTERROGS AND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE W/IN 10 DYAS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, DEFTS SHALL ANSWER THE SUPPLMENTAL AFFIRM DEFENSE INTERROGS W/IN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, DTD 5/6/08 J. GERBER |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED FRANK BRAY Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED STUART M GRAHAM Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWER TO INTERROG Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPROVICH |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED JOSE JAIMES |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED TOM BILLMAN |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOSE JAIMES Filed by ATTORNEY GARY RUSSO |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF TOM BILLMAN Filed by ATTORNEY GARY RUSSO |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI Filed by ATTORNEY GARY RUSSO |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF STUART GRAHAM Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE AT DEPOSITION Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF FRANK BRAY Filed by ATTORNEY JOE HANKIN |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERGS TO DFTS Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION OF DEFTS |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 3/5/08 |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGS TO PLTF Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFTS |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFTS COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP & JORGE ERBITI TO THE COMPLAINT |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED ON 2/2/08 Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED ON 2/1/08 Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$256.00 was made on receipt CAMB193989. Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPROVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DFTS Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING CONTENTION INTERROGATORIES TO DFT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS OF FACT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO DFT Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017579 Filed by DEFENDANT JORGE LUIS LOPEZ ERBITI |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017578 Filed by DEFENDANT COMMUNITY ASPHALT CORP |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPROVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF LYNN DELE KOPRIVICH |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS |