Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC V TOLENTINO, CARMELO
On January 28, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 28, 2008
Last Refreshed
October 02, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. against Carmelo Tolentino, Sandra Tolentino, and other unknown defendants. The plaintiff alleges that a promissory note in the amount of $650,000 was executed and delive…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ASSIGNMENT
Date: Nov 25, 2009ASSIGNMENT
Date: Nov 24, 2009FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023529 PAGE 00325
Date: Oct 26, 2009MOTION
Date: Jun 16, 2009ORDER
Date: Jun 16, 2009MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: Jun 27, 2008MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 02, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 14, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Feb 21, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 28, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 23688 PAGE 0959 ISSUED TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED SERVICE RETURN NOT ON FILE, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE AS TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR SUREPOINT LENDING ABN FIRST RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE NETWORK INC |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLTF FOR $100.00 |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB359829. Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET BANNER AND LAPTOP RECEIPTS ATTACHED |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB359830. Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023529 PAGE 00325 869,352.01 SALE DATE NOV 24 09 DTD OCT 23 09 GARRISON Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC $869,352.01 Nov 24 2009 12:00AM Oct 23 2009 12:00AM 869,352.01 SALE DATE NOV 24 09 DTD OCT 23 09 GARRISON Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY DEFAULT Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2009-10-26 |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 11/24/09 COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS V. CARMELO TOLENTINO PUB PBDBR NOV 9 AND 16 09 Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC 11/24/2009 |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIG DOCS Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF FILING Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE AND AWARDING OF PLTS ATTY FEES OCTOBER 23, 2009 2:30 P.M. |
|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND PLTF NAME AND CASE STYLE Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER AMENDING PLAINTIFF NAME AND CASE STYLE. SIGNED 6/14/09 JUDGE M. SASSER |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY CHAPTER 7 CASE NO 08-27786-EPK Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULE FOR 10/16/08 |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 10/16/08 @ 2:00 / RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT AND AWARDING OF ATTY'S FEES |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT & SANDRA TOLENTINO; UNKNOWN TENANT I NKA GARY ROBINSON AND UNKNOWN TENANT II NKA JANET ROBINSON Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS OF ATTYS FEES Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S CLAIM FOR ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE AND SANDRA TOLENTINO, MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FILED BY ATTY Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND SANDRA TOLENTINO- BRUCE S ROSENWATER & ASSOCIATES P.A. UNAVAILABLE 5/29/08 TO 6/10/08 Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS AND SANDRA TOLENTION. PLT'S COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND SANDRA TOLENTINO Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$265.60 was made on receipt CAMB193949. Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017222 Filed by DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017217 Filed by DEFENDANT CARMELO TOLENTINO |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017219 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT I |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017220 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT II |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022414 PAGE 01111 Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017218 Filed by DEFENDANT SANDRA TOLENTINO |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL COMMENTS Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
PENDING Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC |