Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC V JALLOS, MARTHA
On January 25, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC against the defendants named in the caption. The complaint is divided into two counts.
Count I is an action to reestablish a promissory note under Section 673.3091 of the Florida Stat…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023941 PAGE 01983
Date: Apr 28, 2010ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Mar 11, 2010ORDER GRANTING
Date: Feb 01, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 28, 2010MOTION
Date: Jan 28, 2010MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 28, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 24112 PAGE 0834 ISSUED TO CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $636.80 was made on receipt CAMB459549. Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $636.80 was made on receipt CAMB459548. Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLT FOR $82,400.00 |
|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB455624. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT Filed by DEFENDANT MARTHA JALLOS |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023941 PAGE 01983 $315,997.37 SALE DATE 8/26/10 DTD APRIL 28 2010 $315,997.37 Aug 26 2010 12:00AM Apr 28 2010 12:00AM $315,997.37 SALE DATE 8/26/10 DTD APRIL 28 2010 |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DJ |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 8/26/10 CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC V MARTHA JALLOS ET AL PUB PBDBR AUGUST 11 AND 18 2010 08/26/2010 |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2010-04-28 |
|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE, AND ORIGINAL RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE TO CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DFT RAINBOW LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) RAINBOW LAKE HOA--- SERVED 2/16/10 |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt CAMB382128. Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED RAINBOW LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC SM-10-025063 |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD PARTY DEFENDANTS - DTD FEBRUARY 1, 2010 JUDGE ROSENBERG |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT ADDING DFT, RAINBOW LAKES HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC. Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD PARTY DFT Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARTHA JALLOS |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 02/14/08 Filed by DEFENDANT MARTHA JALLOS |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017041 Filed by DEFENDANT MARTHA JALLOS |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017044 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017043 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-017042 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARTHA JALLOS |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022414 PAGE 01141 Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$261.60 was made on receipt CAMB193848. Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING |