Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC V PEREZ DIAZ, SEBASTIAN
On January 25, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
RESPONSE TO:
Date: Feb 13, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) 04/02/11 10:50 AM Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO 1017 DOGWOOD ROAD WEST PALM BEACH FL. 33409 TO PLT..PBSO-KH WPO-11-001685 Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB530108. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION IS AUTHORIZED TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESION ***SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS*** 3/1/11 |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 24099 PAGE 1155 ISSUED TO HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $200.70 was made on receipt CAMB449220. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $200.70 was made on receipt CAMB449221. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PL FOR $20,100 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED | |
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB443885. |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT SAIRA PEREZ Filed by DEFENDANT STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 8/2/10 HSBC MTG V. SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ PUB PBDBR JUL 16 AND 23 10 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC 08/02/2010 |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2010-06-25 |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023958 PAGE 01626 279,647.32 SALE DATE AUG 2 10 DTD JUN 24 10 COX Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC $279,647.32 Aug 2 2010 12:00AM Jun 24 2010 12:00AM 279,647.32 SALE DATE AUG 2 10 DTD JUN 24 10 COX Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DISPOSED BY JUDGE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/24/10 |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY W/O PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED ISSUED TO HUMAN RESOURCE TYCO INTERNATIONAL COMPASS GROUP |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER (EXPARTE) COMPELLING DISCOVERY - SEE ORDER. G KELLEY |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFF OF INDEBTEDNESS Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 2/2/08 Filed by DEFENDANT SAIRA M PEREZ |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 2/2/08 Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/31/08 Filed by DEFENDANT STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: COMPLAINT (PRO SE) Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$261.60 was made on receipt CAMB193770. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016943 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016941 Filed by DEFENDANT STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016942 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016945 Filed by DEFENDANT SAIRA M PEREZ |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016944 Filed by DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN PEREZ DIAZ |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022425 PAGE 01368 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |