Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC V RAITSES, ARNON
On January 25, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 023530 PAGE 01708
Date: Oct 27, 2009LETTER
Date: Feb 15, 2008ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Feb 08, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 023530 PAGE 01708 DISMISSAL W/O PREJ AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DB |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2009-10-27 |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING DFT MAVIS MYHAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINTE STATEMENT, 3/17/09 , DTD 1/16/09 D HAFELE |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, 11/6/08 @ 8:30 AM, DTD 10/14/08 J GERBER |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY TO TIKVA RAITSES |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY TO AARON RAITSES |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION AS TO DFTS: ARNON RAITES 105 TRANQUILLIA DRIVE, PALM BEACH GARDENS, FL 33418 6 LESLIE LANE, NEW HYDE PARK, NY 11040 TIKVA RAITSES 105 TRANQUILLIA DRIVE, PALM BEACH GARDENS, FL 33418 MANDATORY DATE:05/22/08 PUBLICATION DATES:04/22/08 AND 04/29/08 MAILED ON 04/01/08 |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT ARNON RAITSES |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT TIKVA RAITSES |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/31/08 Filed by DEFENDANT TRANQUILLA AT MIRASOL PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 2/9/08 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 2/9/08 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
LETTER KENNETH CONDON AND LYNETTE CONDON TO COMPLAINT (PRO SE) |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT TRANQUILLA AT MIRASOL PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$261.60 was made on receipt CAMB193701. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022412 PAGE 00679 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016849 Filed by DEFENDANT ARNON RAITSES |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016851 Filed by DEFENDANT TIKVA RAITSES |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016852 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016850 Filed by DEFENDANT TRANQUILLA AT MIRASOL PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-016853 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |