Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC V SIENA CORP
On January 24, 2008 a contract & debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
CONTRACT & DEBT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Bankruptcy
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER
Date: Aug 07, 2008AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: Jul 31, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED - OTHER Associated to docket SGBK filed on 2008-11-21 |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/12/08 @ 2 PM. Filed by ATTORNEY NATHAN A SCHWARTZ |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT J HOY |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT, PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. UP 8/31/08. Filed by ATTORNEY NATHAN A SCHWARTZ |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY'S FEES. |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED Filed by DEFENDANT SIENA CORP |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT SIENNA CORP Filed by PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 5/31/08 Filed by DEFENDANT SIENA CORP |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY HAS FILED A PETITION FOR RELIEF (BANKRUPTCY CASE NO 08-14115) Filed by DEFENDANT DIPAKRAY M PAREKH |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-083199 Filed by DEFENDANT DIPAKRAY M PAREKH |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ASM-08-002773 Filed by DEFENDANT DIPAKRAY M PAREKH |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT SIENA CORP |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT DIPAKRAY M PAREKH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-015238 Filed by DEFENDANT DIPAKRAY M PAREKH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-015237 Filed by DEFENDANT SIENA CORP |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$256.00 was made on receipt CAMB193340. Filed by PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC |